SLOUGH U3A

Charity number: 1203806
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

U3A exsists for the advancement of education and, in particular, the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work, by all means, including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Magnus-Watson Chair 17 January 2024
None on record
JENNIFER WARD Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Peter Ward Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Peter Charles Beesley Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Debra Ann Magnus-Watson Trustee 18 January 2023
None on record
Christine Elizabeth Isles Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Eleanor Cryer MBE Trustee 19 October 2016
SLOUGH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT & SHOPMOBILITY
Received: On time
ST MARY'S SCHOOL CHARITY SLOUGH
Received: On time
LANGLEY INSTITUTE OF MINISTRY
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
73 THE FRITHE
WEXHAM
SLOUGH
SL2 5SX
Phone:
01753534299