1ST SOUTHPORT (AINSDALE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sefton
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- 1ST SOUTHPORT SCOUTS (Working name)
- AINSDALE SCOUTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristine Marie Jarman | Trustee | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Dawbarn | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Morgan | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria o'Malley | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNELIESE MARY RIMMER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 05 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Marie Kiernan | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAURA REEVEY | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA HELEN MCCARTER | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR SPENCER WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK AUSTIN FURNESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Samuel Frank ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DIANE TIERNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MARGARET LAWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.29k | £29.82k | £40.17k | £39.24k | £34.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.30k | £21.94k | £21.49k | £39.80k | £41.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912. REGISTRATION DATE UNKNOWN FROM FILE RECORDS. DEFAULT DATE 01/01/61 RECORDED AS DATE OF REGISTRATION.
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
SOUTHPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WARD AVENUE
FORMBY
LIVERPOOL
L37 2JD
- Phone:
- 01704877292
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window