Financial history 1ST THORNTON-CLEVELEYS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.34k £29.02k £25.45k £26.34k £39.00k
Total expenditure £20.62k £10.02k £25.75k £33.19k £26.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £9.20k N/A £500