MILES FOR SMILES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we raise money to enable us to support people in our local community with life limiting , life changing circumstances and disabilities through organised events such as music events and family fun days .
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 July 2023: CIO registration
- MFS (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Luke Worker | Chair | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mitchel james summers | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James michael welland | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Codi James Musk | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Parker | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Elkin | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LIFE LIMITING OR LIFE CHANGING HEALTH CONDITIONS, OR WHO ARE DISABLED, LIVING IN SOUTH DERBYSHIRE, NORTHWEST LEICESTERSHIRE OR EAST STAFFORDSHIRE BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED TO ENHANCE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, CHARITIES AND OTHER VOLUNTARY, COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS WHO SUPPORT THOSE IN NEED AND WHOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES ARE IN LINE WITH THOSE OF MILES FOR SMILES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O suite 15 A
blakenhall farm
caldwell
swadlincote
DE12 6RU
- Phone:
- 01283 296295
- Website:
-
milesforsmiles.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.