COMMUNITY CATCH LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Co-develop tools and mechanisms with stakeholders that provide market access for small-scale fishery products. Develop a fishery certification standard tailored to small-scale fisheries. Collaborate with key organisations and platforms that provide market access (ratings, market platforms). Develop innovative mechanisms to facilitate market access for small-scale fishers.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Indonesia
- Mexico
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 15 August 2024: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CATCH (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Burton | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wood | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kafayat Fakoya | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Redfern | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Hough | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Leadbitter | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Andriamalala | Trustee | 15 August 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF AQUATIC ECOSYSTEMS AND THE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF SMALL-SCALE FISHING OPERATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A. ESTABLISHING AND PROMOTING THE APPLICATION OF A BROAD SET OF PRINCIPLES, STANDARDS AND CRITERIA FOR SUSTAINABLE SMALL-SCALE FISHERIES; B. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION, IN PARTICULAR WHERE TO DO SO CONTRIBUTES TO THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN COASTAL COMMUNITIES; C. PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF SMALL-SCALE FISHERIES, AND ENSURING THE SUSTAINABILITY OF GLOBAL FISH STOCKS AND THE HEALTH OF AQUATIC ECOSYSTEMS; D. ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN GOOD PRACTICES IN SMALL-SCALE FISHERY MANAGEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIELD SEYMOUR PARKES
1 LONDON STREET
READING
RG1 4PN
- Phone:
- 01189516200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.