1ST NELSONS BOY SCOUT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting for Young People Girls and Boys age 6y to 14y form the local area including children with disability's and medical conditions. To help them contribute to the community with the skills they learn from scouting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Trafford
Governance
- 24 February 1965: Standard registration
- 06 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.42k | £4.13k | £3.94k | £3.92k | £1.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £4.25k | £3.25k | £3.12k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 March 2010 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 28 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 02 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 24TH JULY, 1964 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
1ST NELSONS BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
URMSTON AND FLIXTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window