Financial history 1ST WALTON-LE-DALE (ST LEONARDS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.65k £9.38k £6.31k £11.99k £10.19k
Total expenditure £11.68k £6.61k £6.08k £12.08k £7.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A