BABU ALLAH DITTA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping people in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 31 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aqif Hussain | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Asif Hussain | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allah Ditta | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abid Hussain | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2023
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR SUCH PURPOSES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, BY PROVIDING SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
A A CARPETS & FURNITURE
12-14 LEAGRAVE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8HZ
- Phone:
- 07958310279
- Email:
- asiftwo@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window