Accounts and annual returns WIDNES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 521700
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 25 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 25 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 15 May 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 12 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 14 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 16 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window