Financial history 4TH WIDNES (ST. BEDE'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.68k £24.83k £24.94k £7.77k £16.35k
Total expenditure £10.48k £7.38k £14.57k £8.31k £12.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A £1.84k