Financial history ST LUKES WIDNES SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.23k £32.77k £33.45k £19.64k £31.11k
Total expenditure £8.52k £9.10k £23.56k £17.36k £23.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A