RUDDINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include but are not restricted to: Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching Baptism Communion of the Lord's Supper Evangelism and mission Teaching, encouragement and inclusion of young people Nurture and growth of Christian disciples Christian and community service Pastoral care Encouraging charitable social action Connecting with other churches
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Andrew Bairstow | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Greenhalgh | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Whitton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ruth Molyneux | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Frances Elizabeth Third | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. 3.2 [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHURCH FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Musters Road
Ruddington
Nottingham
NG11 6HW
- Phone:
- 07311311958
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.