Accounts and annual returns THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION COUNTY OF MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 521714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window