Financial history THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION COUNTY OF MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 521714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £55.46k £103.95k £21.06k £42.96k £83.80k
Total expenditure £58.99k £83.27k £15.70k £29.54k £100.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A