Governing document THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION COUNTY OF MERSEYSIDE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 26/10/1949AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 27/04/1960,AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 04/09/1981AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 20/07/1993, AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 16/12/1993, AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 10/07/2013,AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 30/03/2015,AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 14 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.