ASHBY AND COALVILLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities for boys and girls from the Ashby & Coalville area of Leicestershire. There are 16 scout groups and 7 Explorer Scout sections, totalling 1092 young people aged 6-18. Activities range from arts and crafts to camping and expeditions. Scouting sees children of all ages grow up and develop into well rounded young people, many go onto other youth activities and leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 February 1964: Standard registration
- ASHBY AND COALVILLE BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Farrar | Chair | 02 August 2014 |
|
|||||
Robert Barry Andrews | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bryan Nevin | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Elizabeth Bailey | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Mitchell | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Stephen Pope | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Keith Watts | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.65k | £20.74k | £52.18k | £127.32k | £130.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.91k | £45.39k | £54.84k | £91.93k | £113.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £23.74k | £25.44k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 31 December 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
ASHBY AND COALVILLE BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ASHBY AND COALVILLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Oak Spinney Park
Ratby Lane
Leicester Forest East
Leicester
LE3 3AW
- Phone:
- 07966435405
- Website:
-
acds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window