ASHBY HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. We encourage our young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, Ashby Hastings Scout Group gives young people of Ashby de la Zouch & surrounding area the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 06 October 1964: Standard registration
- ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH (HASTINGS) SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- FIRST ASHBY BOY SCOUTS GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Oliver Edward Thomas | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Martin Blair | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stokes | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Dean Dale | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Thomas William Starkey | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Bell | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.80k | £23.22k | £24.67k | £12.51k | £17.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.73k | £8.86k | £17.43k | £15.34k | £16.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £295 | £18.25k | £13.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1963 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955 AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashby Hastings Scout Hut
Wilfred Gardens
ASHBY-DE-LA-ZOUCH
Leicestershire
LE65 2GX
- Phone:
- 01530460526
- Email:
- hello@ashbyhastings.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window