BIRSTALL DISTRICT GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 521721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Birstall District Girlguides is part of Girlguiding UK and as such: enables girls and young women to fulfil their potential to take an active and responsible role in society through its distinctive stimulating and enjoyable programme of activities delivered by trained volunteer leaders.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £17,468
Total expenditure: £20,753

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST AND 2ND BIRSTALL GIRLS GUIDES COMPANIES AND PACKS (Previous name)
  • BIRSTALL DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Freemantle Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
Hollie Davison Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Gemma Jeffs Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
MARIE ELEANOR UPTON Trustee 01 May 2014
None on record
CORINNE GRETA STANT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £794 £10.25k £41.90k £4.43k £17.47k
Total expenditure £703 £1.11k £57.61k £5.73k £20.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 20 March 2023 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 March 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 DENEGATE AVENUE
BIRSTALL
LEICESTER
LE4 3GH
Phone:
01162671043
Website:

No information available