1ST BOTTESFORD BOY SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 521722
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income: £50
Total expenditure: £422
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Leicestershire
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £2.99k | £1.44k | £26 | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £1.98k | £2.05k | £411 | £422 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 March 2016 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 03 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1957 UPON THE TRUST OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
A GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOTTESFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window