VITA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VITA is a clinician-led organisation equipping healthcare professionals, systems and services to respond skillfully to human trafficking, slavery and exploitation. VITA has trained thousands of health professionals with transferable, trauma-informed, advanced safeguarding and consultation skills. VITA Network connects multi-disciplinary professionals in a public-health approach to trafficking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 June 2023: CIO registration
- VITA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rosie Riley BSc MBChB | Chair | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Donald Rendle Thompson BA Hons MBBS | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Maria Anna Hill BSc Hons | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Osayewenre Odaro | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Boutros MBBS MRCPCH | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Carolyn Wood BM MA MRCPCH | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ABOUT HEALTH ISSUES AFFECTING PERSONS IMPACTED BY HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND OTHER FORMS OF HUMAN EXPLOITATION BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO TRAINING, RESEARCH, ADVOCACY, CONSULTANCY AND PROFESSIONAL NETWORKING IN ORDER TO BETTER EQUIP PROFESSIONALS, SYSTEMS AND SERVICES ACROSS HEALTH AND OTHER SECTORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GEMMA HOUSE
39 LILESTONE STREET
LONDON
NW8 8SS
- Phone:
- 07441440077
- Email:
- info@vitafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window