Our Food Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help regions to promote regenerative farming. We communicate knowledge about modern small-scale regenerative farming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £3,319 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 2023: Standard registration
- CONSERVATION FARMING TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George James Stewart Wallis | Chair | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES STEUART SKINNER | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Albrecht Bielenberg | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 SEP 2021 as amended on 21 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CONSERVATION OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIODIVERSITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROMOTING AND FACILITATING FARMING PRACTICES THAT CONTRIBUTE TO THE REGENERATION OF THE EARTH'S PHYSICAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES; AND (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND FARMERS IN PARTICULAR INTO THE BENEFITS THAT FARMING THAT CONTRIBUTES TO THE REGENERATION OF THE EARTH'S PHYSICAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES HAS ON BIODIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CRiC
BEAUFORT STREET
CRICKHOWELL
POWYS
NP8 1BN
- Phone:
- 02089953000
- Email:
- hello@our-food.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window