EUREKA MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advancing the Christian faith for the benefit of the public throughout Manchester and the surrounding area in accordance with the Statement of Faith by providing facilities for Christian worship, prayer, religious education, Bible study, outreach and pastoral care for the community locally and overseas in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Manchester City
Governance
- 01 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nelson Kwaku Owusu | Chair | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Albert Ewusi | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BAABA NKANSAH | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jun 2023 as amended on 11 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PRAYER, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, BIBLE STUDY, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE FOR THE COMMUNITY LOCALLY AND OVERSEAS IN GHANA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CLAYBROOK CLOSE
ATHERTON
MANCHESTER
MANCHESTER
Lancashire
M46 0GG
- Phone:
- 07740981289
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window