KEEPING OUR YOUTHFULNESS ACTIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
keeping mind and body active through sports and social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amir Miah | Chair | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
abdul sami | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||
azad miah | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
mohammed afruz miah | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
mohammed rokibi islam | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ali akbar | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruab Ali | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ansarul hoque | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
fakrul miah | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
mohammed asim aksar | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
gourmet building
Windsor Works
Ellen Street
OLDHAM
OL9 6QR
- Phone:
- 07872511226
- Email:
- koya.oldham@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window