DUDHAL FI BHANTAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dudhal Fi Bhantal provide support to educational support to migrant communities across the UK by providing free in-person and online lessons. We also support people living in social isolation and loneliness by befriending them and helping them with their daily activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saadu Keita | Chair | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sidi Bah | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdourahmane Sow | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN GBENTU CHIEFDOM, FALABA DISTRICT, SIERRA LEONE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A LEARNING RESOURCE CENTRE TO PROVIDE SECONDARY SCHOOL PUPILS AND TEACHERS IN THAT AREA WITH A FACILITY FOR STUDY AND LINKED RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
190D VALLEY ROAD
LONDON
SW16 2XS
- Phone:
- 07882935258
- Email:
- ksaadu@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window