1st Nanpantan Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides resources to enable the effective running of 1st Nanpantan Scout Group at its headquarters in Nanpantan. The age range covered is from 6 to 14 years and the members follow the training of The Scout Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 02 October 1963: Standard registration
- 1ST NANPANTAN SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- NANPANTAN BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Rhodes | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Pellereau | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Anne Tomkins | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Emmett | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Burgess | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Smith | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Diaper | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Sean Jinks | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Miles | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joe Putt | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Carl Travis-Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
John O'Flynn | Trustee | 15 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM NEWTON | Trustee | 07 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PREETI KITCHING | Trustee | 25 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.49k | £32.98k | £31.36k | £62.56k | £32.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.60k | £16.68k | £27.89k | £35.99k | £42.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.24k | £2.52k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 January 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 02 January 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 04 September 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4 JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28 MARCH 1949, 18 FEBRUARY 1959, 5 MAY 1967 AND 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
NANPANTAN BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
LOUGHBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Lindisfarne Drive
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 4FX
- Phone:
- 07900247441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window