HALESWORTH MILLENNIUM GREEN CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Halesworth Millennium Green CIO maintains a 50 plus acreage of public open space including meadows, woodlands, a community orchard, ponds, dykes, hedges, copses, a heritage railway, the New Reach and a section of Sustans Number 1 cycle path. The Green is be used forever as an area for the public to enjoy informal recreation, play, exercise or other leisure-time activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,349 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 April 2023: CIO registration
- 04 November 2024: Funds received from 1079518 HALESWORTH MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
- HALESWORTH MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Harrison | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reuben Perkins | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John William Bainer Jr | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JENKINSON | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Kirkeby | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Apr 2023 as amended on 06 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HALESWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAIN THE OPEN SPACE KNOWN AS “HALESWORTH MILLENNIUM GREEN” TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND TO INCLUDE SIGNIFICANT NATURAL AREAS WHERE PEOPLE CAN ENJOY WILDLIFE AT FIRST HAND AND TO MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THE LOCAL ENVIRONMENT AND RESPECT THE ESTABLISHED CHARACTER OF THE AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halesworth Library
Bridge Street
HALESWORTH
Suffolk
IP19 8AD
- Phone:
- 07803338708
- Email:
- thegreen@halesworth.net
- Website:
-
millenniumgreen.halesworth.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window