Harborough District Scout Council

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides administration and financial support to Scouting within a defined geographical area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 October 1963: Standard registration
- MARKET HARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- MARKET HARBOROUGH BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Catt | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Dove | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Allenby | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Reed | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Helm | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Dove | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP REED | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
EDDIE HARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC STANLEY GAMBLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.94k | £44.40k | £57.92k | £88.04k | £127.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.92k | £34.68k | £44.24k | £93.62k | £116.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1947 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935 as amended on 16 Sep 2020 as amended on 12 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
MARKET HARBOROUGH BOY SCOUTS AND GUIDES
Area of benefit
MARKET HARBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Weir Road
Kibworth Beauchamp
LEICESTER
LE8 0LP
- Phone:
- 07778744126
- Website:
-
harboroughscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window