COMPASSION FOR CREATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our organisations focus is on the educational needs of people. We try to make an impact through our own dedicated seminars , workshops and retreats which provide holistic support for the physical, mental and spiritual well-being of participants. As well as helping directly we look towards supporting other organisations (registered charities) working in the same field to complement their work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- United States
Governance
- 31 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aydarus Elmi | Chair | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Zeeshan Asghar | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Syed Talha Asad Ullah Jung | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE UK AND INDIAN SUBCONTINENT BY:- THE DISTRIBUTION OF FREE LITERATURE (SUCH AS THE QURAN); THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL LECTURES, SEMINARS, AND WORKSHOPS, TO ANY PERSONS EXPRESSING AN INTEREST; PROVIDING EDUCATION AND GUIDANCE OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION TO PEOPLE SUFFERING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, SPIRITUAL ISSUES AND ADDICTIONS (I.E. ALCOHOL, DRUGS AND GAMBLING) AND MAKING REFERRAL WHERE NECESSARY TO RELEVANT MEDICAL ORGANISATIONS / PERSONS; AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DEPRIVATION TO ANY PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Compassion Fund
85 Great Portland Street
First Floor
London
W1W 7LT
- Phone:
- 07507372599
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window