CHERIBIM AND SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH, JEHOVAH JIREH DISTRICT, AYO NI O UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
O ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SEEM FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 April 2023: CIO registration
- CHERIBUM AND SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH, JEHOVAH JIREH DISTRICT, AYO NI O UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIDEMI AJOKE OTUNUYI | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL AKINNIYI SUNDAY OGUNGBE | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOFOLUWAKE KEHINDE OLUWABUSAYO | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE TO THE STATEMENT OF FAITH) IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SEEM FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
175 Heaton Lane
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK4 1AQ
- Phone:
- 07943335353
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window