LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting exists to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
2315 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 16 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHIMLEY | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Samuel Arnold | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Bijal Bhagwan | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Colwell | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary McNulty-Green | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wardle | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Jack Callum Barber | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WREN | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Griffin | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD COPPOCK | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BLACK | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Adrian Wray | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £570.01k | £213.69k | £255.38k | £314.11k | £471.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £617.83k | £236.73k | £282.69k | £352.82k | £508.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £56.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £486.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £617.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £116.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
9 Oak Spinney Park
Ratby Lane
Leicester Forest East
LEICESTER
LE3 3aw
- Phone:
- 0116 2872475
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window