OASIS COMMUNITY HUB: FIR VALE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HUB PROVIDES A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES FOR ALL AGES IN THE COMMUNITIES OF FIR VALE, SHEFFIELD, SOUTH YORKSHIRE. THE HUB INCLUDES OASIS ACADEMY FIR VALE, OASIS ACADEMY WATERMEAD, AND OASIS ACADEMY DON VALLEY. CURRENT ACTIVITY INCLUDES YOUTH WORK, COMMUNITY WORK, FAMILY SUPPORT, FAMILY LEARNING, HOLIDAY ACTIVITIES, ADVICE & GUIDANCE AND ADULT EDUCATION.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 October 2023: Standard registration
- OASIS FIR VALE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hornsby | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Carol Blakeley | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Whittle | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
(2) THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH GENERALLY C) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OASIS CENTRE
1 Kennington Road
LONDON
SE1 7QP
- Phone:
- 02079214200
- Email:
- info@oasisuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.