PEOPLES HELP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peoples Help Foundation provides food, clean water, and essential aid to disadvantaged communities. We operate locally and internationally, supporting those in need through food distributions, water projects, and emergency relief. Our mission is to alleviate hardship, especially during Ramadan, by delivering humanitarian assistance with compassion and integrity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pakistan
Governance
- 10 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saghira Hussain | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Qurban Hussain | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mohammad Zabair | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Zahoor Iqbal | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Muhammad Haroon Arshad | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PAKISTAN FOR CHILDREN AGED 3 TO 13 BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR EDUCATIONAL SUPPLIES AND THE REPAIRS AND MAINTENANCE OF PRIMARY SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 EDMUND STREET
BRADFORD
BD5 0BH
- Phone:
- 01617166041
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window