ST. MARY'S CHURCH, WATTON

Charity number: 1203822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is in the Parish of Watton and operates as a church, its website (www.stmaryswatton.org) shows opening hours, a full summary of activities and events. Income is derived from the generosity of the congregation, visitors/other benefactors, fund raising events and rental of the church premises. Income is spent on the running cost and upkeep of the church, missions and outreach.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £121,698
Total expenditure: £113,438

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David James Cossey Chair 14 May 2023
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Eileen Wendy Kittell Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Weiwei Cui Trustee 10 January 2024
MOTHERS' UNION: (NORWICH DIOCESE)
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Rev CHRISTINA MARY MASON Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Stephen Andrew Bibby Trustee 14 May 2023
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
MIRJAM JOHANNA JOHNSON Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
GILLIAN MARY SMITH Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
VALERIE SEMLYEN Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Andrew Guy Turner Trustee 22 March 2021
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
MOTHERS' UNION: (NORWICH DIOCESE)
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
PAUL DOUGLAS WEATHERILL Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
ELAINE VICTORIA RODGERS Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
MICHAEL SELVEY Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Linda Kathleen Benton Trustee 31 March 2017
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
STEVENS' ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
JANET ROMA SELVEY Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
MERVYN WILCOX Trustee 11 October 2015
None on record
MARGARET CATOR Trustee 13 April 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £111.71k £121.70k
Total expenditure £104.18k £113.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 14 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 14 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARY'S CHURCH
CHURCH ROAD
WATTON
THETFORD
IP25 6DQ
Phone:
01953881252
Website:

STMARYSWATTON.ORG