VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Holbeach Hurn Village Hall and Playing Field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 March 1964: Standard registration
- HOLBEACH HURN VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leon Rudman | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN HENRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SUSAN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JENNY WORTH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARILYN HENRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.66k | £10.98k | £1.76k | £1.33k | £2.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.00k | £3.78k | £8.58k | £3.22k | £4.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 1ST MAY 1950
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST LUKE HOLBEACH HURN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD WHITE HOUSE
BAILEYS LANE
HOLBEACH HURN
HOLBEACH
SPALDING
PE12 8JP
- Phone:
- 01406422319
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window