WESTON HILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes,Sport and recreation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,491
Total expenditure: £8,287

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 November 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY CASSON Chair
WESTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MOULTON HARROX EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SOUTH HOLLAND PARISH VOLUNTARY CAR SERVICE
Received: On time
Nigel Stennett Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
PAM GRUMMITT Trustee
None on record
BEN HALGARTH Trustee
None on record
Andrew Short Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.26k £21.77k £11.61k £7.42k £8.49k
Total expenditure £5.41k £3.57k £7.83k £7.42k £8.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.00k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
357 Broadgate
Weston Hills
Spalding
PE12 6DB
Phone:
01406380650
Website:

No information available