GOD IS ABLE, CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM SHILOH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian religion, education, evangelism and youth mobilization. Monday prayer warriors meeting to support people in need of prayer at 7pm to 9pm. Wednesday Shiloh service to intercede for those seeking mercy and favour from God at 12pm to 4pm Friday night vigil service to wait on the lord at 10pm to 12 midnight Sunday service to worship and adore the lord at 10am to 4pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Regina Adeyemi | Chair | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Musibau Abiola Adetayo Atekoja | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND SUCH PARTS OF THE PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. TENETS OF FAITH ? THE DIVINE INSPIRATION AND INFALLIBILITY OF THE HOLY BIBLE IN ALL MATTERS OF FAITH AND CONDUCT (2 TIMOTHY 3:16; 2 PETER 1:21). ? THE TRINITY OF THE GODHEAD AND UNITY OF THE THREE PERSONS (FATHER, SON AND THE HOLY SPIRIT) THEREIN (1 JOHN 5:7). ? ONE GOD AND FATHER OF ALL, WHO HAS REVEALED HIMSELF FULLY TO MANKIND THROUGH HIS ONLY BEGOTTEN SON, JESUS CHRIST (1 TIMOTHY 2:5). ? THE DEITY AND LORDSHIP OF JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED IN THE WHOLE OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES (JOHN 10:30). ? THE PERSONALITY AND DEITY OF THE HOLY SPIRIT (JOHN 14:16-17). ? ANGELS EXIST AND THEIR FUNCTION IS TO FULFIL GOD?S ASSIGNMENTS HERE ON EARTH (PSALMS 103:20-21) ? THE UTTER DEPRAVITY OF THE WHOLE HUMAN NATURE AND THE GUILT OF ALL MANKIND SINCE THE FALL OF THROUGH THE DECEIT OF THE DEVIL, THEREBY RENDERING MANKIND SUBJECT TO GOD?S WRATH AND CONDEMNATION (ROMANS 3:23). ? THE SUBSTITUTIONARY ATONEMENT FOR SIN THROUGH THE BLOOD OF JESUS CHRIST, THE INCARNATE SON OF GOD (HEBREWS 9:14). ? THE FULL SALVATION BY GRACE THROUGH FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST ALONE BY THE MEANS OF WHICH ONE IS BORN AGAIN (EPHESIANS 2:8-9). ? WATER BAPTISM BY IMMERSION AT AN AGE OF ACCOUNTABILITY AS AN OUTWARD DEMONSTRATION OF AN INNER CONVICTION (MATTHEW 3:13-15). ? THE BAPTISM OF THE HOLY SPIRIT FOR THE BORN AGAIN BELIEVER, DENOTING THE ENDOWMENT OF POWER FROM ON HIGH FOR SERVICE, EVIDENCED BY SPEAKING IN TONGUES (ACTS 1:5,8; 2:1-4). ? THE OPERATION OF THE GIFTS OF THE HOLY SPIRIT SUBJECT TO SOUND SCRIPTURAL GUIDANCE (1 CORINTHIANS 12:1-11). ? THE UTMOST FREE WILL OF THE BELIEVER IN MATTERS OF CHOICE AT ANY AGE OF THE CHRISTIAN LIFE WITH ITS RESULTANT CONSEQUENCES (GALATIANS 6:7). ? ONE HOLY UNIVERSAL CHURCH WHICH IS THE BODY OF CHRIST, TO WHICH ALL BELIEVERS BELONG (ROMANS 12:5). ? ORDERLINESS AND COMPORTMENT IN PUBLIC WORSHIP AS MOTIVATED BY THE HOLY SPIRIT (1 CORINTHIANS 14:32-33). ? CHRISTIAN PERFECTION AND HOLINESS, THROUGH ABSOLUTE SURRENDER AND CONSECRATION (1 PETER 1:15-16). ? MINISTRY THROUGH THE LAYING ON OF HANDS SUBJECT TO SOUND SCRIPTURAL GUIDANCE WHEREBY OPPORTUNITIES ARE OPENED TO BELIEVERS TO ENJOY DIVINE HEALING AND HEALTH (MATT 16:18). ? THE HOLY COMMUNION (THE LORD?S SUPPER OR BREAKING OF BREAD) IN OBEDIENCE TO OUR LORD?S COMMANDMENT (2 CORINTHIANS 11:20-30). ? TITHING AND FREE-WILL OFFERING AS GOD?S FINANCIAL PLAN FOR THE CHURCH (MALACHI 3:10-12). ? CORPORATE AND PERSON TO PERSON EVANGELISM AS EXPRESSION OF GOD?S LOVE TO THE WORLD AND IN OBEDIENCE TO THE LORD?S COMMANDMENT (MATTHEW 28:19-20). ? MODESTY AND CHASTITY IN ALL MATTERS OF CHRISTIAN CONDUCT (COLOSSIANS 3:17). ? THE RESURRECTION OF OUR LITERAL BODIES, THE JUST AND THE UNJUST; WHEN THE UNJUST WILL RECEIVE FINAL JUDGMENT (REVELATION 20:13-15). ? THE SECOND COMING OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE JUDGMENT SEAT WHERE HE WILL REWARD THE SAINTS (JOHN 14:2-3; REVELATION 22:12).
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 LELITIA CLOSE
POWNALL ROAD
LONDON
E8 4SN
- Phone:
- 07932489071
- Email:
- Godisableshiloh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window