AL JARRYAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Philippines
- The Gambia
Governance
- 05 July 2023: CIO registration
- Foundation MedianCI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Steve McQueen | Chair | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Otillon Christian Leon | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jee Ann Lim | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 April 2024 | 25 April 2025 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2023 as amended on 29 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN GAMBIA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
45-55 Commercial Street
London
E1 6BD
- Phone:
- 07957180221
- Email:
- info@al-jarryah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window