Financial history YOUNG PEOPLE'S TRUST, CARLTON LE MOORLAND

Charity number: 521826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/07/2020 24/07/2021 24/07/2022 24/07/2023 24/07/2024
Total gross income £7.44k £8.07k £7.79k £8.08k £8.54k
Total expenditure £3.48k £2.96k £15.79k £7.51k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A