Governing document YOUNG PEOPLE'S TRUST, CARLTON LE MOORLAND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24TH JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2005, 29 JANUARY 2007, 11 JUNE 2007, 18 JULY 2007 AND 4 AUGUST 2008.
Charitable objects
PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUTH OF THE PARISH OF CARLTON-LE-MOORLAND WITH THE OBJECT OF FURTHERING THEIR DEVELOPMENT THROUGH LEARNING, SPORT AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUTH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CARLTON-LE-MOORLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.