BE HUMAN KIND LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to to the relief of those in need by reason of financial hardship, ill health, particularly dementia or through old age, to promote social inclusion for the public benefit in Billericay and it's surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 10 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAM GOYAL | Chair | 15 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Ramandeep Kaur Sandhu | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vishal Sharma | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
BEENA GOYAL | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 APR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
4. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO: 4.1 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL HEALTH, PARTICULARLY DEMENTIA, OR THROUGH OLD AGE THROUGH THE OPERATION OF A SOUP KITCHEN; AND 4.2 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BILLERICAY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE OBJECTS, ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH, OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) AND IN PARTICULAR, THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS WHO WILL HAVE REDUCED OR LIMITED OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL ENGAGEMENT. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE OBJECTS SHALL BE ADVANCED BY: 4.3.1 PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES THOSE WHO ARE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 4.3.2 PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT; AND 4.3.3 SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
REGENT HOUSE
BATH AVENUE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 4EG
- Phone:
- 07903096157
- Email:
- accounts@humankindcafe.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window