SOUTH NORMANTON COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship among people living in South Normanton, Derbyshire by assisting such persons in financial need with support through goods and services which they could not always afford through lack of means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 July 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Bridges | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE COOKE | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2023 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY (OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) FOR THOSE LIVING IN SOUTH NORMANTON, DERBYSHIRE BY PROVIDING ITEMS, SUCH AS FOOD PARCELS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
129 Ball Hill
South Normanton
ALFRETON
Derbyshire
DE55 2EB
- Phone:
- 07748654860
- Email:
- sncommunitygroup@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window