HIDDEN DISABILITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Create awareness of hidden disabilities within the community Provide website with information on hidden disabilities provide local events for wellness, social, personal development and expert advice to support those with hidden disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 08 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Margaret Newton | Chair | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Woomble Houfe | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Robert Grant McCallum | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Wardell | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Woomble Headland | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THOSE PEOPLE IN HULL AND EAST RIDING WHO LIVE WITH HIDDEN DISABILITIES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT, ADVICE AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERSDALE
STATION ROAD
BURSTWICK
HULL
HU12 9JG
- Phone:
- 07882503475
- Email:
- natalie@poolheat.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window