AMPLIFYCHANGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AmplifyChange's objects are restricted specifically to the preservation and protection of the physical and mental health of the public, particularly (but not exclusively) in relation to sexual and reproductive health, by promoting education, increasing access to reproductive health services, and supporting advocacy, by removing barriers and by protecting human rights or climate change.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Bangladesh
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 August 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Narmeen Altaf Hamid | Chair | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dana Scott Hovig | Trustee | 13 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nyovani Janet Madise | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lana Rae Dakan | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Seims | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 FEB 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUL 2024 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE FOLLOWING: THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN RELATION TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, BY: (A) PROMOTING EDUCATION; (B) INCREASING ACCESS TO REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH SERVICES; AND (C) SUPPORTING ADVOCACY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO REMOVING BARRIERS TO SAFE ABORTION, ELIMINATING GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE, PROTECTING THOSE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF UNWANTED OR UNPLANNED PREGNANCY AND VIOLATION OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH AND RIGHTS, AND PROTECTING HUMAN RIGHTS (INCLUDING IN RELATION TO SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION) OR CLIMATE CHANGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOUSE OF ST. JOHNS
1 QUEEN SQUARE
BATH
BA1 2HA
- Phone:
- 07900993949
- Email:
- Enquire@amplifychange.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.