Financial history EDENHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.13k £910 £14.27k £12.90k £15.61k
Total expenditure £8.50k £4.77k £16.38k £14.00k £15.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.21k N/A £300