THE FOLKINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A rural village hall used by local clubs of all ages and many other charity events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 March 1964: Standard registration
- FOLKINGHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Lynch | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harris | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric Eve | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Shea | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Thrush | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Meeds | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Vivian Erika Davy-Makwana | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Clark | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.15k | £12.61k | £15.71k | £10.29k | £7.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.15k | £14.03k | £7.90k | £8.80k | £8.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | £1.13k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9TH AUGUST 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISUR-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FOLKINGHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Folkingham Village Hall
Market Place
Folkingham
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 0SE
- Phone:
- 01529497721
- Email:
- fvhsecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window