COMMUNITY OF TEGARU IN BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA, UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tigrayans and people of Tigray heritage in Birmingham and surrounding area, who are socially excluded on the grounds of their ethnic origin, religion, belief or creed to relieve the needs of such people and assist them to integrate into society, in particular by: Increasing opportunities for members of the Tigrayan community to engage with service providers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 01 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mehari Atsbaha | Chair | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fessaha Tareke Bayene | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mihiretab Kidanemariam | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahder Tsehaye | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kbrom Gebremedihin | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Hadish Tsehaye | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Kidane Tesfay | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Asfaw Aregay | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Weyni Memberu | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF TIGRAYANS AND PEOPLE OF TIGRAY HERITAGE IN BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. INCREASING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE TIGRAYAN COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. 2. PROVIDING PEER SUPPORT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES THAT BUILD PEOPLE’S CONFIDENCE AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. 3. PROMOTING EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 4. BUILDING PEOPLE’S KNOWLEDGE AND CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN CULTURAL HERITAGE AND ITS POTENTIAL CONTRIBUTION TO A MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 VAUXHALL ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4HW
- Phone:
- 07449650750
- Email:
- tigraycomm22@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window