SCREDINGTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The property and the trust fund and its income shall be applied for the purposes of a community centre and to provide and maintain a recreation ground and playing field for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Scredington and neighbourhood. Including the use of the property for meetings, lectures and classes or other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 15 September 1965: Standard registration
- 11 August 2011: Funds received from 1021538 SCREDINGTON PLAYING FIELD
- SCREDINGTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Metcalfe | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Frankie Salkeld | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thompson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bob Richards | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Metcalfe | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alan Pywell | Trustee | 01 April 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | £12.02k | £10.73k | £26.56k | £24.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £6.76k | £12.53k | £33.97k | £21.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/08/2011
Charitable objects
(1)THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A)A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I)MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II)OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B)A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SCREDINGTON, LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scredington Community Centre
Church Lane
Scredington
SLEAFORD
Lincolnshire
NG34 0AG
- Phone:
- 07415846546
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window