SHARE KNOWSLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help refugees and asylum seekers access all they are entitled to, providing advocacy case work, health and well being support & advice to help them with integration and settlement. We run 2 weekly drop-ins where people can meet others in a safe space, relax, and access help, as well as offering English classes and social events. We help raise awareness in the local community of refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
Governance
- 10 August 2023: CIO registration
- 27 February 2025: Funds received from 1179562 SHARE KNOWSLEY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN HENDERS | Chair | 07 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Hannah Deane | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ibtisam Idris Hamad Idris | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Derefaka | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ghazaleh Zarrabi-Kashani | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MONAGHAN | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £478 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE BOROUGH OF KNOWSLEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL, ECONOMIC AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO PROMOTE THE INTEGRATION AND INCLUSION TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND RAISE AWARENESS ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School House
St John's Road
Huyton
Liverpool
Merseysi
- Phone:
- 07915252300
- Email:
- Admin@shareknowlsey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window