UPOTTERY VILLAGE HALL (THE MANOR ROOM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a village community building (village hall) for the use of the inhabitants of the area for social/recreational/educational purposes at an affordable price.
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 27 July 2023: CIO registration
- 03 March 2025: Funds received from 266681 THE MANOR ROOM
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Henry | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Jane Baker | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Elizabeth Saull | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Francis Wigram | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Clare Molyneaux | Trustee | 27 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Marshallsay | Trustee | 26 February 2010 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Claire Sheard | Trustee | 25 February 2003 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN JOHN BARTLETT | Trustee | 21 February 1990 |
|
|||||
David Reginald Arthur Key | Trustee | 23 February 1986 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP FRANCIS JOYCE | Trustee | 24 February 1971 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF UPOTTERY, DEVON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (OBJECTS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MANOR ROOM
UPOTTERY
HONITON
EX14 9PL
- Phone:
- 07814760123
- Email:
- upotterymanorrooms@gmail.com
- Website:
-
upotteryvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.