CHRIST CHURCH MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 04 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan Colin Oxnard | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Strike | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN STOCKTON-ON-TEES, ITS SURROUNDING AREAS AND WORLDWIDE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND PRAYER, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION. LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY: AND TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED IN STOCKTON-ON-TEES, ITS SURROUNDING AREAS, AND WORLDWIDE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, INCLUDING IN ASSOCIATION WITH ORGANISATIONS HAVING A COMPLIMENTARY PURPOSE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 VICTORIA AVENUE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS20 2QB
- Phone:
- 07907577552
- Website:
-
christchurchmission.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window